MD SB901 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the purpose of the Maryland Trauma Physician Services Fund to include subsidizing the documented costs incurred by the State primary adult resource center to maintain certain on-call and standby health care providers; and requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to develop certain guidelines for the reimbursement of certain costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Trauma Fund - State Primary Adult Resource Center - Reimbursement of On-Call and Standby Costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-27HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-22HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-20SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-04SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback