MD SB901 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purpose of the Maryland Trauma Physician Services Fund to include subsidizing the documented costs incurred by the State primary adult resource center to maintain certain on-call and standby health care providers; and requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to develop certain guidelines for the reimbursement of certain costs.
Title
Maryland Trauma Fund - State Primary Adult Resource Center - Reimbursement of On-Call and Standby Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Accidents
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Physicians
Prices
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Physicians
Prices
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation