MD SB9 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB703
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the certification agency designated by the Board of Public Works to study and report recommendations for streamlining the process for certification of minority business enterprises; requiring the certification agency to submit the findings of the study to the Legislative Policy Committee by December 1, 2022, in preparation for the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly; and requiring certain entities to provide certain information to the certification agency.
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 514 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-4) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {923628/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {153026/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB703 (Carry Over) 2021-03-26 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Data
Federal Government
General Services, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Minorities
Privatization
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Women
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Data
Federal Government
General Services, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Minorities
Privatization
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |