MD SB898 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each law enforcement agency to develop and implement a policy requiring the investigation of a certain officer-involved death; requiring that the policy require the investigation to be performed by at least two investigators who have certain qualifications; requiring the investigators to submit a certain report to a certain State's Attorney at a certain time; requiring the investigators to release the report to the public under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Investigation of an Officer-Involved Death (Law Enforcement Trust and Transparency Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateHearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
2019-03-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-22SenateHearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback