MD SB893 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to open a special or other enrollment period for an individual who consents to share information through a certain system; establishing certain requirements for a certain enrollment period; authorizing the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to conduct outreach to an individual who consents to share information using certain methods; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to take certain actions to carry out the State's unemployment insurance law; etc.
Title
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-31) |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {457170/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Checks
Claims
Communications
Contractors
County Executives
COVID-19
Data
Disabilities
Electronic Funds Transfer
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Fraud
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Insurance
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Language
Mobile Devices
Notices
Public Information
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telephones
Time
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor, and Employment
Claims
Communications
Contractors
County Executives
COVID-19
Data
Disabilities
Electronic Funds Transfer
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Fraud
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Insurance
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Language
Mobile Devices
Notices
Public Information
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telephones
Time
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 31 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |