MD SB893 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education, the Maryland Department of Health, and the Behavioral Health Administration jointly to develop and publish a certain handbook regarding safe Internet, social media, and technology usage for certain students, parents, and teachers on or before July 1, 2021; requiring the handbook to include certain information and best practices; requiring certain agencies to consult with certain professionals when developing a certain handbook; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health – Cyber Safety Handbook – Handbook Development and Publication

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-13HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-11SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-11SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback