MD SB891 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to develop certain guidelines for solar panel stewardship programs to ensure the environmentally sound recycling of out-of-service solar panels and their components; requiring the Department to adopt certain guidelines in regulation on or before July 1, 2021; prohibiting a certain manufacturer from selling or offering for sale in the State a solar panel on or after January 1, 2022, unless the manufacturer has a solar panel stewardship plan approved by the Department; etc.
Title
Environment - Solar Panel Stewardship Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Electronic Communication
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fees
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Heating and Cooling
Industry and Technology
Penalties and Sentences
Recycling
Reports
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Solar Energy
Weights and Measures
Consumer Protection
Electronic Communication
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fees
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Heating and Cooling
Industry and Technology
Penalties and Sentences
Recycling
Reports
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Solar Energy
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1733 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1734 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1735 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1736 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1737 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1738 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1739 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0891?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0891f.pdf |