MD SB891 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the maximum civil penalty that may be assessed against a person for a violation of the Maryland Antitrust Act from $100,000 to $10,000 for each violation; and providing that each day a violation of the Act continues is a separate violation.
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-48) (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848 |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-48) |
2018-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Antitrust Enforcement
Assessments
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Consumer Protection
Corporations
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Assessments
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Consumer Protection
Corporations
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Time