MD SB89 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "qualified employee" to include certain individuals who are provided certain paid parental leave for purposes of a credit against the State income tax for certain small businesses that provide certain employer benefits to certain qualified employees; altering the calculation of the credit; providing that the total amount of credit certificates issued by the Department of Commerce in any taxable year may not exceed $5,000,000; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Relief Tax Credit – Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {189033/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-01-11SenateHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-11SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback