MD SB888 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 401
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that, under certain circumstances, the personal representative or guardian of the last remaining member of a limited liability company shall automatically be admitted as a new member, unless a certain action is taken; authorizing certain persons to wind up the affairs of a limited liability company under certain circumstances; authorizing a court to wind up the affairs of a limited liability company on the application of certain persons under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 401
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-03-15HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {888779/1 Adopted
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB983 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 400

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations and Associations107A-03(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations121003(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations4A1002(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations4A101(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations4A1103(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations4A211(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations4A601(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations4A604(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations4A606(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations4A902(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations4A904(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations9A1203(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback