MD SB887 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State Board of Dental Examiners from requiring a person to be licensed by the Board in order to engage in specified activities in the State; and altering the definition of "practice dentistry".
Title
Health Occupations - Dentistry - Scope of Practice and Licensure Exception
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Dentists
Health Occupations
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Real Property
Work, Labor and Employment
Contracts
Dentists
Health Occupations
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Real Property
Work, Labor and Employment