MD SB886 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a trustee to send certain interested parties in a certain manner a certain report when the trust terminates or on the resignation or removal of the trustee in accordance with the terms of the trust or certain provisions of law; providing that, if an interested party does not submit an objection to the report within 120 days after the trustee mailed the report, the interested party shall be deemed to have released the trustee and to have consented to and ratified the actions of the trustee; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 362
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-03-15HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {608672/1 Adopted
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB904 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Estates and Trusts5904(n/a)See Bill Text
Estates and Trusts5907(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback