MD SB886 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removing Frederick County from the list of counties required to grant specified property tax setoffs to municipal corporations; requiring the governing body of Frederick County to annually meet and discuss with the governing body of each municipal corporation in the county the county property tax rate to be set for assessments of property; requiring, if the county and the municipal corporation fail to reach an agreement, the county to grant a tax setoff in accordance with the formula used in the preceding taxable year; etc.
Title
Frederick County Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Frederick Municipalities)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-2) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {359934/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Assessments
Community Facilities and Services
Frederick County
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Taxes - Property - Local
Community Facilities and Services
Frederick County
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Taxes - Property - Local