MD SB885 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to design a voluntary developmental disability self-disclosure card; establishing certain requirements for the card; requiring the Administration to consult with certain groups in designing the card; requiring the Administration to make the card available to certain individuals on request; and prohibiting the Administration from keeping records related to the issuance of the card, subject to a certain exception.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {208078/1 Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-05SenateReassigned to Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB1118 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 427

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation12111(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation16118.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback