MD SB885 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the statutory formula that determines the compensation required to be paid to the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund on condemnation of land under a certain easement held by the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation; requiring the Foundation to distribute a portion of certain compensation to a certain entity under certain circumstances; altering the definition of "economic or residential development"; and applying the Act.
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under Easement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {600719/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Bridges and Tunnels
Easements
Land Preservation Trusts
Public Works, Board of
Salaries and Compensation
Zoning and Planning
Agriculture
Bridges and Tunnels
Easements
Land Preservation Trusts
Public Works, Board of
Salaries and Compensation
Zoning and Planning