MD SB884 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to convene a Workgroup to Study the Establishment of an Affordable Assisted Living Enhanced Care Program; requiring the Workgroup to examine many factors related to the need for affordable assisted living residences including the number required, locations, services needed, funding sources and eligibility; and requiring The Department to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the Workgroup's findings and recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Health - Workgroup to Study the Establishment of an Affordable Assisted Living Enhanced Care Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-03-08SenateRereferred to Finance
2023-02-09SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB1231 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-07 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback