MD SB883 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to authorize qualified persons to offer and perform testing for detecting sickle cell disease at a community-based health fair; and authorizing the person to provide information on and resources for living with sickle cell disease while performing testing at a community-based health fair.
Title
Public Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Testing at a Community–Based Health Fair
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1170 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-23 - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Diseases
Examinations
Fairs
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Medical Conditions
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Community Facilities and Services
Diseases
Examinations
Fairs
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Medical Conditions
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 18 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0883?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0883f.pdf |