MD SB881 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB635
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Practice Known as "Swatting" to study the laws applicable to and make recommendations relating to legislative changes to prohibit the practice known as "swatting"; and requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2023.
Title
Task Force to Study the Practice Known as "Swatting"
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-04-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m. |
2022-03-29 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {753025/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB635 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Damages
Death
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Fraud
Injury
Jurisdiction
Liability
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Sunset
Violence
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Damages
Death
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Fraud
Injury
Jurisdiction
Liability
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Sunset
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 9 | 501.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |