MD SB881 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that the enrollment of a residential electric customer in a certain payment plan or the participation of the customer in a certain program is a material change in contract; providing for the automatic termination, without penalty, of a contract for electricity service between a residential electric customer and an electricity supplier under certain circumstances; requiring an electricity supplier to refer a certain customer's account to the standard offer service available through a certain electric company; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Electric Customers - Automatic Termination of Electricity Supply Contract

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-04SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback