MD SB881 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the elements of the prohibitions against human trafficking and renaming them sex trafficking; prohibiting a person from knowingly obtaining or procuring for any person the labor or services of another by certain means; prohibiting a person from knowingly causing another to engage in a debt bondage; prohibiting a person from aiding, abetting, or conspiring with another to violate the Act; establishing that the lack of knowledge about a victim's age is not a defense to certain offenses involving a child; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments {838470/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-20SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback