MD SB879 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a process by which a defective corporate act may be ratified by a board of directors of a corporation; requiring a corporation ratifying a defective corporate act that would have required a filing with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to file articles of validation with the Department; authorizing an adversely affected person or entity to file an action contesting a ratification under the Act; and applying the Act to real estate investment trusts.
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {213320/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {763027/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB996 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Charters
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Courts
Notices
Time
Voting
Charters
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Courts
Notices
Time
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 8 | 601.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |