MD SB878 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the allocation of funds from the Racetrack Facility Renewal Account by adding the Bowie Race Course Training Center to the list of thoroughbred racing facilities eligible to receive the funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-18SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-14SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-02-08SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback