MD SB877 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Generally curing previous Acts of the General Assembly with possible title defects; and generally repealing and reenacting without amendments certain Acts of the General Assembly that may be subject to possible title defects in order to validate those Acts.
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Senate Rules |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |