MD SB877 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $100,000 to $250,000 the maximum cost of a certain construction project that may be wholly financed with funds from the Waterway Improvement Fund.
Title
Waterway Improvement Fund - Public Boating Construction Projects - Financing Limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Chesapeake Bay
Construction
Dredging
Environmental Matters
Marinas
Natural Resources - Generally
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Sewage
Sports and Recreation
Water
Waterway Improvement Fund
Chesapeake Bay
Construction
Dredging
Environmental Matters
Marinas
Natural Resources - Generally
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Sewage
Sports and Recreation
Water
Waterway Improvement Fund