MD SB872 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to enforce certain provisions of law under certain applicable powers; requiring the Commissioner to adopt certain regulations under certain circumstances that are consistent with certain federal regulations, rules, and guidance; prohibiting certain carriers from excluding or limiting certain benefits or denying certain coverage because a certain health condition was present on a certain date; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Consumer Protections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (106-25)
2020-03-17HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (128-4)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-03-15HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (36-9)
2020-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {543229/1 (Senator West) Adopted
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Adopted
2020-03-12SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator West) Adopted
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {847273/1
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-02-04SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB959 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance15137.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A10(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A11(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A12(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A13(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A14(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A15(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A16(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A17(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A18(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A19(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A20(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A21(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A22(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A4(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A5(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A6(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A7(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A8(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15-1A9(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback