MD SB872 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing in Worcester County the State Highway Administration, on its own initiative or at the request of a local authority, to designate an area on a State highway as a special event zone and reduce established speed limits in the special event zone after making a certain determination; authorizing a local authority to designate an area on a highway under its jurisdiction as a special event zone and reduce established speed limits in the special event zone after making a certain determination; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {108677/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Boundaries
Counties
Emergency Bills
Fairs
Fines
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Jurisdiction
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Worcester County
Counties
Emergency Bills
Fairs
Fines
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Jurisdiction
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Worcester County