MD SB871 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing the State Board of Social Work Examiners in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2025, the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; establishing the Workgroup on Social Worker Requirements for Licensure to make certain findings and recommendations regarding examination and licensure of social workers in the State; requiring the Workgroup to submit its final report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2024; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social Workers - Sunset Extension, Notification of Complete Application, and Workgroup on Social Worker Requirements for Licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228
2023-04-10SenatePassed Enrolled
2023-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2023-04-10SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2023-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2023-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {593027/1 Adopted
2023-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2023-03-22HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-03-20HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2023-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2023-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {913522/1 Adopted
2023-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2023-02-17SenateHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-17SenateHearing canceled
2023-02-08SenateHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations19302(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations19302.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations19303(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations19304(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations19309(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0871?ys=2023RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0871f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0871t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0871e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/Chapters_noln/CH_228_sb0871e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0871_91352201.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0871_59302701.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/sb0871_fin.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/sb0871_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/Senate/0634.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/1093.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/Senate/1220.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback