MD SB870 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the ex officio status of specified members of the Board of Governors of the Garrett County Memorial Hospital; imposing limits on the number of consecutive terms specified members of the Board of Governors may serve; increasing from 1 to 2 weeks the notice required before removing a member of the Board of Governors; authorizing the Board of Governors to implement the rates for hospitalization as prescribed by the Health Services Cost Review Commission; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Memorial Hospital - Board of Governors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {787975/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Garrett County
Hospitals
Notices
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Counties - Local Laws
Garrett County
Hospitals
Notices
Prices
Reimbursement Rates