MD SB87 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Hearing: Mar 11 @ 1:00 pm Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the State song; requiring the Maryland State Arts Council to develop a plan for and conduct a certain State song competition, including the acceptance of certain entries to the competition, and to carry out certain tasks relating to the competition; requiring the Council to report certain finalists of the competition to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021; authorizing the Council to make certain recommendations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Provisions – State Song – Repeal and Competition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-09-22SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB389 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-05 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions7318(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions7319(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback