MD SB869 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the purposes for which certain anatomical gifts may be used; repealing provisions of law that require certain persons to search certain individuals for a document of gift or any other information identifying the individual as a donor, that specify procedures to be taken if a document is located, and that concern certain administrative sanctions; requiring a certain procurement organization to make a certain search of certain registries under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {898275/1 Adopted
2020-03-12SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {898275/1
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB1133 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Estates and Trusts4509(n/a)See Bill Text
Estates and Trusts4510(n/a)See Bill Text
Estates and Trusts4512(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback