MD SB868 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Career and Technology Education Committee; requiring the Committee to establish certain statewide goals for career and technical education; stating the purpose of the Career and Technology Education Innovation Grant in fiscal years 2021 or 2022; requiring the Committee to administer the Career and Technology Education Innovation Grant; extending the termination date for a certain tax credit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Apprenticeship Maryland 2030

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2020-02-19SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
2020-02-19SenateHearing canceled (Finance)
2020-02-07SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2017(n/a)See Bill Text
Education21202(n/a)See Bill Text
Education21204(n/a)See Bill Text
Education21205(n/a)See Bill Text
Education21207(n/a)See Bill Text
Education7111(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment11106(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment11702(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment11708(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback