MD SB868 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the establishment of transportation network services in the State; requiring specified motor vehicle insurance to be issued by specified insurers under specified circumstances; prohibiting a person from operating a specified motor vehicle for hire under a specified permit unless the person holds a specified license issued by the Public Service Commission; authorizing the Commission to issue a permanent driver's license if the applicant submits a specified criminal background check; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation
Sponsors
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-04-13 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2015-04-13 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {587871/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Accidents
Assessments
Claims
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Contracts
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Disabilities
Discipline
Disclosure
Discrimination
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
Fingerprinting
For-Hire Driving
Inspections
Insurance Administration
Investigations and Inquiries
Labeling
Licenses
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Prices
Prince George's County
Privacy
Public Service Commission
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse
Taxicabs
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation
Utility Regulation
Assessments
Claims
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Contracts
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Disabilities
Discipline
Disclosure
Discrimination
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
Fingerprinting
For-Hire Driving
Inspections
Insurance Administration
Investigations and Inquiries
Labeling
Licenses
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Prices
Prince George's County
Privacy
Public Service Commission
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse
Taxicabs
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation
Utility Regulation