MD SB867 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide certain health insurance benefits under certain insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for certain diagnostic laboratory tests for Lyme disease; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Coverage for Diagnostic Laboratory Tests for Lyme Disease

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-04SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback