MD SB866 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing an individual who is serving in the armed forces of the United States to purchase a resident hunting license, resident bow and arrow stamp, resident black powder stamp, and resident bonus antlered deer stamp if the individual is stationed in the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resident Hunting Licenses and Stamps - Members of the Armed Forces

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
2020-02-06SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-05SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources4604(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources4745(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback