MD SB866 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that certain budget information must be submitted to each county that supports the College of Southern Maryland; eliminating the requirement to submit an annual report and to report on certain expenditures; altering the budget approval requirements for the College; and providing that the approval of the budget by the majority of counties that support the College constitutes approval of the budget and binds the counties.
Title
College of Southern Maryland - Local Budget Process - Modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reassigned to Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Budgets
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Counties
Local Government Mandates
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Counties
Local Government Mandates
Reports
State Universities and Colleges