MD SB865 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to December 31, 2030, the termination of a credit against the public service company franchise tax for the purchase of Maryland-mined coal; authorizing the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to approve up to $3,000,000 in total credits each year; etc.
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB969 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 8 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0865?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0865f.pdf |