MD SB864 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a health care provider to disclose certain medical and legal records without the authorization of an individual to a public defender who states in writing that the Office of the Public Defender represents the individual; requiring that only those records needed by the public defender to represent the individual shall be disclosed; requiring the records to be provided within 24 hours after a certain request; prohibiting a hearing officer from ordering the release of a certain individual on certain grounds; etc.
Title
Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {866787/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-30 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-30 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {817279/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Disclosure
Elderly Persons
Electronic Communication
Health Care Facilities
Hearings
Legal Aid
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Patients
Public Employees
Public Health
Records
Veterans
Vulnerable Adults
Disclosure
Elderly Persons
Electronic Communication
Health Care Facilities
Hearings
Legal Aid
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Patients
Public Employees
Public Health
Records
Veterans
Vulnerable Adults