MD SB863 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a personal needs allowance of not less than $450 per month or $5,400 per year for certain Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients who receive certain long-term care services and supports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Long-Term Care Services and Supports - Personal Needs Allowance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateHearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-17SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB1091 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General15122.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback