MD SB862 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1599
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a judge of the District Court or judge of a circuit court, on a finding of good cause, to recall an arrest warrant issued by a District Court commissioner and issue a summons in its place.
Title
Arrest Warrants Issued by District Court Commissioners - Recall by Judge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1599 (Carry Over) 2020-02-14 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |