MD SB861 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the requirement that the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission register certain individuals as certifying providers; altering the definition of "written certification" to alter the information that is required to be included and to require that the certification be in the form prescribed by the Commission; authorizing a certifying provider to issue written certificaitons for certain medical conditions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Registration of Certifying Providers - Repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {538675/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback