MD SB861 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law that prohibit the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County from issuing specified alcoholic beverages licenses in specified election districts in the County; providing that the Board may issue anywhere in the County, regardless of election district, any license authorized under a specified provision of law; requiring that a specified public hearing be held for a license; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Dry Election Districts - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Frederick County
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Public Information
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Frederick County
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Public Information