MD SB859 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 107
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for enforcement only as a secondary offense for a violation of the requirement to maintain vehicle registration plates to be free from foreign material and to be clearly legible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Registration Plate Frames and Borders - Enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 107
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (131-1)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-03-16HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (39-6)
2020-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB200 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 106

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation13411(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback