MD SB858 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB623
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an entity licensed to offer instant bingo under a commercial bingo license on July 1, 2007, to operate up a certain number of electronic instant bingo machines.
Title
Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-4) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment {763520/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {453921/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Zucker) Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {453921/1 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB858 (Carry Over) 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1316 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1316 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Criminal Law | 12 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |