MD SB857 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the limit on the number of permits to operate gaming devices that the County Commissioners for Queen Anne's County may issue to an organization in a single year; and authorizing the county commissioners to determine the number of permits to issue to an organization in a single year.
Title
Queen Anne's County - County Commissioners - Gaming Permits
Sponsors
Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2010-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:15 p.m. | |
2010-02-25 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Churches
County Commissioners
Equipment
Fire Protection
Gaming
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Queen Anne`s County
Veterans
County Commissioners
Equipment
Fire Protection
Gaming
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Queen Anne`s County
Veterans