MD SB856 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing from $1,500,000 to $2,000,000 the amount that the State Comptroller is required to distribute of specified abandoned property funds each year to the Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-49) (Y: 92 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-12) (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
2017-04-10SenateReturned Passed
2017-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (92-49)
2017-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2017-04-05HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-04-04HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2017-03-31HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2017-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (33-12)
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {288072/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-07SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0856&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0856f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0856t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_839_sb0856t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0856_28807201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0856.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0856_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0856_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0856,s-0947&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0856,h-1433&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback