MD SB854 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that, under certain circumstances, a covered employee or a dependent of a covered employee is not entitled to worker's compensation or benefits if a certain accidental personal injury, compensable hernia, or occupational disease was caused solely by the effect of medical cannabis on the employee and the medical cannabis was not administered or taken with the written certification of a certifying provider or the written instructions of a physician; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {688671/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback