MD SB853 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB126
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility requirements for an individual to be certified by the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission as a police officer to require an individual to be a United States citizen or a permanent legal resident of the United States who is an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces and who has applied to obtain United States citizenship and the application is pending approval; requiring the certification of a police officer who fails to obtain United States citizenship to be terminated; etc.
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-30) (Y: 107 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (107-30) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {178772/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB853 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Subjects
Armed Forces
Certifications
Immigrants and Citizenship
Law Enforcement
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Residency
Veterans
Certifications
Immigrants and Citizenship
Law Enforcement
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Residency
Veterans