MD SB852 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB35

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to provide a certain inmate with a reentry kit that includes clothing, an identification card, contact information on reentry services, information on Medicaid and the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, and transportation; providing that a person who uses a firearm in the commission of a crime of violence is guilty of a felony and establishing certain penalties; prohibiting a dealer or other person from selling, renting, loaning, or transferring a regulated firearm under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-02HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (32-15)
2021-04-01SenateMotion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted (26-18)
2021-03-31SenateMotion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Carter) Adopted
2021-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {648272/1 Adopted
2021-03-29SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
2021-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {648272/1
2021-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-26SenateHearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
2021-02-26SenateHearing canceled
2021-02-09SenateHearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
2021-02-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

SB35 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings12302(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure5202(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law14101(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law4204(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law4306(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law4404(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law7104(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services6101(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services9609.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5133(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5134(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback