MD SB849 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified report to include specified information on all procurement contracts awarded by the State to minority business enterprises, including a description of the contract and specified additional information; and requiring a specified report to include information about certified minority business enterprises that participated as prime contractors or subcontractors on specified procurement contracts.
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (46-1) | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (44-3) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-22 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Contractors
Contracts
Electronic Government
Minorities
Procurement
Public Information
Reports
Contractors
Contracts
Electronic Government
Minorities
Procurement
Public Information
Reports