MD SB847 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the parking of a disabled, inoperable, or immobilized vehicle on a public street for more than 7 days in Washington County; requiring that certain notice be posted on a vehicle parked in violation of the Act prior to towing the vehicle; requiring that certain notice be provided following the impounding of a vehicle under the Act; establishing a certain penalty of up to $500; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Title
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
Highways
Notices
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Towing
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Washington County
Highways
Notices
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Towing
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Washington County